S No |
Commissioners |
Period |
1 |
Sh. J.S. Ahlawat IAS |
17.03.2010 to
17.10.2010 |
2 |
Smt. Neelam P. Kasni IAS |
17.10.2010 to
07.05.2012 |
3 |
Smt. Renu S. Phullia IAS |
07.05.2012 to
16.07.2013 |
4 |
Sh. Vikash Yadav IAS |
|
5 |
Sh. Balraj Singh IAS |
|
6 |
Dr. J. Ganeshan IAS |
|
7 |
Sh. Arvind Malhan HCS |
|
8 |
Ms. Sumedha Kataria HCS |
|
9 |
Dr. Aditya Dahiya IAS |
|
10 |
Dr. Priyanka Soni IAS |
|
11 |
Sh. Rajiv Mehta IAS |
|
12 |
Sh. Nishant Kumar Yadav IAS |
|
13 |
Sh. Rajiv Mehta IAS |
|
14 |
Sh. Nishant Kumar Yadav IAS |
|
15 |
Sh. Vikram IAS |
20.10.2020 to
04.06.2021 |
16 |
Dr. Manoj Kumar IAS |
07.06.2021 to 12.02.2022 |
16 |
Sh. Naresh Narwal IAS |
19.02.2022 to 28.08.2022 |
16 |
Sh. Ajay Singh Tomer IAS |
29.08.2022 |